Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/25/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/10/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/10/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/10/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/10/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/10/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/10/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/10/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/10/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/10/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/10/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/10/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/10/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/24/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/24/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/24/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/02/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/02/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/02/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/02/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/09/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/09/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/09/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/23/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/23/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/23/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/23/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/06/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/06/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/06/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/07/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/03/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/03/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/03/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/06/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/06/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/06/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/06/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/22/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/19/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/19/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/19/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/19/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/19/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/19/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/15/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/15/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/15/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/15/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/15/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/15/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/09/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/15/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/15/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/20/1998