Committees: H.R.2281 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/29/1997 Referred to
04/01/1998 Markup by
05/22/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-551,Part 1
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property08/07/1997 Referred to
09/17/1997 Hearings by
02/26/1998 Markup by
02/26/1998 Reported by
House Commerce05/22/1998 Referred to
07/17/1998 Markup by
07/22/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-551,Part 2
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection05/26/1998 Referred to
06/05/1998 Hearings by
06/18/1998 Markup by
06/18/1998 Reported by
House Ways and Means05/22/1998 Referred to
07/22/1998 Discharged from