Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/30/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/30/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/30/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/30/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/30/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/30/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/30/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/30/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/30/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/30/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/30/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/30/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/30/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/30/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/30/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/30/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/30/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/30/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/30/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/30/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/30/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 09/30/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/30/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/02/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/02/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/02/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/02/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/02/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/02/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/02/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/02/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/07/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/07/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/07/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/07/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/07/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/07/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/09/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/09/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/21/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/21/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/21/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/21/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/21/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/21/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 10/21/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/22/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/22/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/22/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/30/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/31/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/04/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/04/1997