Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/11/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/05/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/06/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/08/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/03/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/12/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/12/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/23/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/23/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/23/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/23/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/10/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/17/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/11/1998