Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/31/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/10/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/10/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/16/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/16/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/17/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/06/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/06/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/06/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/23/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/23/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/23/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/29/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/29/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 11/06/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/12/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/11/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/09/1998