There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Drive for Teen Employment Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Drive for Teen Employment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Drive for Teen Employment Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Drive for Teen Employment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a change in the exemption from the child labor provisions of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 for minors between 16 and 18 years of age who engage in the operation of automobiles and trucks.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/31/1998Became Public Law No: 105-334. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998Presented to President.
10/13/1998Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H10796-10798)
10/12/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/31/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber
10/31/1998Became Public Law No: 105-334. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998HousePresented to President.
10/13/1998-5:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/13/1998-5:40pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H10796-10798)
10/13/1998-5:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/13/1998-5:26pmHouseMr. Fawell moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
10/13/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/12/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/12/1998SenateS.Amdt.3816 Amendment SP 3816 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/12/1998SenateAmendment SP 3816 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/12/1998SenateS.Amdt.3816 Proposed by Senator Jeffords. To make certain technical corrections concerning the effective date.
10/12/1998SenateAmendment SP 3816 proposed by Senator Jeffords.
10/12/1998SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S12397-12398)
10/01/1998SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/28/1998-3:34pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/28/1998-3:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/1998-3:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/28/1998-3:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/28/1998-3:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9124-9127)
09/28/1998-3:18pmHouseMr. Fawell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/01/1998HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/01/1998HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/06/1998HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
03/06/1998HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
09/19/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/31/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
07/31/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/18/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/18/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/18/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/18/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/18/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/18/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/18/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/18/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/26/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/26/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/06/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/22/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/22/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/22/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/22/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/22/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/22/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/28/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/31/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/31/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/05/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/12/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/12/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/05/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/22/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/22/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/28/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/31/1997 Referred to
04/01/1998 Markup by
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections09/19/1997 Referred to
03/06/1998 Markup by
03/06/1998 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2327.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2327. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/12/1998)

Drive for Teen Employment Act - Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to prohibit employees under age 17 from driving automobiles and trucks on public roadways.

Allows employees who are age 17 to drive automobiles and trucks on public roadways, subject to certain distance, work-hour, and other restrictions.