Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/18/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/18/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/18/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/18/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/18/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/18/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/18/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/18/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/26/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/26/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/26/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/06/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/06/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/22/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/22/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/22/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/22/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/22/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/22/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/28/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/31/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/31/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/05/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/12/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/12/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/03/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/12/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/05/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/22/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/22/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/28/1998