There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Transportation Technology Deployment Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 23, United States Code, to authorize Federal participation in financing of projects to demonstrate the feasibility of deployment of magnetic levitation transportation technology, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/31/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
10/07/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1960-1961)
Action By: House of Representatives
08/14/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/14/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/06/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology.
Action By: Committee on Science
07/31/1997Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1997Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1997Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1997Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Science, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/08/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/1997

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/31/1997 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads08/14/1997 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Surface Transportation08/14/1997 Referred to
House Science07/31/1997 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Technology08/06/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/31/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2341. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/31/1997)

Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Transportation Technology Deployment Act of 1997 - Declares that it is U.S. policy to establish a MAGLEV transportation technology system (i.e., transportation systems employing magnetic levitation that would be capable of safe use by the public at a speed in excess of 240 miles per hour) operating along Federal-aid highway and other rights-of-way as part of a national transportation system.

Amends Federal transportation law to direct the Secretary of Transportation to: (1) establish a High-Speed Ground Transportation Office in the Federal Railroad Administration to coordinate and administer all authorized high-speed rail and MAGLEV programs, to make available financial assistance to provide the Federal share of full project costs of eligible projects selected, and to otherwise carry out this Act; and (2) solicit applications from States, or authorities designated by one or more States, for financial assistance authorized for planning, design, and construction of eligible MAGLEV projects.

Sets forth provisions regarding the Federal share, authorized uses of assistance, and project eligibility.

Directs the Secretary to establish criteria for selecting eligible projects, evaluate the projects, and select projects to receive financial assistance.

Authorizes the Secretary to provide funding for a project even if high-speed rail technologies in addition to MAGLEV are still being evaluated for the project under specified circumstances where a State law directs a State entity to prepare a plan to construct and operate a high-speed rail system.

Sets forth provisions regarding joint ventures.

Directs the Secretary to conduct research regarding the quantification of benefits derived from the implementation of MAGLEV technology, MAGLEV safety, and the development of domestic MAGLEV technologies and technologies associated with MAGLEV infrastructure.

Sets forth reporting requirements. Authorizes appropriations from the Highway Trust Fund to carry out this Act.

Specifies that, for the purpose of obtaining tax-exempt bond financing under the Internal Revenue Code, a MAGLEV facility shall be considered to be a high-speed intercity rail facility with an average speed greater than 150 miles per hour.