Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 07/31/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/31/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/08/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/08/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/08/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/08/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/08/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/18/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/18/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/18/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/06/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/21/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/24/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/24/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 11/04/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/04/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/04/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/12/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 11/12/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/03/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/11/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/02/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/02/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/02/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/05/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/18/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/25/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/23/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/16/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/14/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/15/1998