Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/31/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 07/31/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/07/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/07/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/09/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/12/1997