Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 08/01/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 08/01/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 09/05/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/05/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/08/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/08/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/18/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/26/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/26/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/26/1997