Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/23/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/23/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/29/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/29/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/29/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/06/1997