Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/03/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/05/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/05/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/05/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/09/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/09/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/10/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/10/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/10/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/16/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/17/1997