There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Popular Titles

U.S.-Taiwan Anti-Ballistic Missile Defense Cooperation bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States-Taiwan Anti-Ballistic Missile Defense Cooperation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

United States-Taiwan Anti-Ballistic Missile Defense Cooperation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Taiwan Anti-Ballistic Missile Defense Cooperation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To implement the provisions of the Taiwan Relations Act concerning the stability and security of Taiwan and United States cooperation with Taiwan on the development and acquisition of defensive military articles.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
11/06/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 301 - 116 (Roll no. 601).
10/06/1997Committee on National Security discharged.
10/06/1997Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 105-308, Part I.
09/03/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/18/1998SenateSubcommittee on East Asian and Pacific Affairs. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Foreign Relations Subcommittee on East Asian and Pacific Affairs
11/07/1997SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/06/1997-9:03pmHouseThe Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2386.
11/06/1997-9:03pmHouseOn motion to table the motion to reconsider Agreed to by recorded vote: 245 - 175 (Roll no. 602).
11/06/1997-8:43pmHouseMr. Bereuter moved to table the motion to reconsider
11/06/1997-8:43pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to reconsider the vote.
11/06/1997-8:43pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 301 - 116 (Roll no. 601).
11/06/1997-8:19pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
11/06/1997-7:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed debate.
11/06/1997-7:29pmHouseH.Amdt.469 On agreeing to the Bereuter amendment (A002) Agreed to without objection.
11/06/1997-7:29pmHouseH.Amdt.469 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Bereuter.
11/06/1997-7:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
11/06/1997-7:23pmHouseH.Amdt.468 On agreeing to the International Relations amendments (A001) Agreed to without objection.
11/06/1997-7:23pmHouseH.Amdt.468 Amendments (A001) by the Committee on International Relations and considered as adopted pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 302.
11/06/1997-7:23pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2358, H.R. 2232, H.R. 2195, H. Res. 188 and H.R. 967. Providing for the sequential consideration in the House of the following measures: H.R. 2358, H.R. 2232, H.R. 2195, H. Res. 188, H.R. 967, H.R. 2570, H.R. 2386, H.R. 2605, and H.R. 2647. One hour of general debate is provided for each measure. Specified amendments are in order.
11/06/1997-7:23pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 302. (consideration: CR H10149-10158)
10/06/1997HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 179.
10/06/1997HouseCommittee on National Security discharged.
10/06/1997HouseHouse Committee on National Security Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 6, 1997.
10/06/1997HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 105-308, Part I.
09/30/1997HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
09/30/1997HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
09/26/1997HouseExecutive Comment Received from State.
09/24/1997HouseExecutive Comment Requested from State.
09/23/1997HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
09/18/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
09/03/1997HouseReferred to House National Security
09/03/1997HouseReferred to House International Relations
09/03/1997HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on National Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/03/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations09/03/1997 Referred to
09/30/1997 Markup by
10/06/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-308
House International Relations Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific09/18/1997 Referred to
House National Security09/03/1997 Referred to
10/06/1997 Discharged from
Senate Foreign Relations11/07/1997 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations Subcommittee on East Asian and Pacific Affairs06/18/1998 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2386. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/06/1997)

United States-Taiwan Anti-Ballistic Missile Defense Cooperation Act - Directs the Secretary of Defense to study and report to the Congress on: (1) the architecture requirements for the establishment and operation of a theater ballistic missile defense system in the Asia-Pacific region capable of protecting Taiwan from ballistic missile attacks; and (2) cooperative United States measures which would provide Taiwan with an advanced local-area ballistic missile defense system.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the President, upon the request of the Taiwan Government, and in accordance with such study results, should transfer to the Taiwan Government defense articles or services under the foreign military sales program of the Arms Export Control Act for the purpose of establishing and operating a local-area ballistic missile defense system to protect Taiwan and specified islands against limited ballistic missile attacks.

Declares that it is in the U.S. national interest that Taiwan be included in any effort at ballistic missile defense cooperation, networking, or interoperability with friendly and allied nations in the Asia-Pacific region.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the Clinton Administration should make clear to the People's Republic of China the firm commitment of the American people for security and democracy for the people of Taiwan, and that the United States fully expects the peaceful resolution of security issues on both sides of the Taiwan Strait.