Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 09/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/16/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/16/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/16/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/26/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/26/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/26/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/26/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/26/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/24/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/31/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/31/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/31/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/31/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/07/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/07/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/03/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/30/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/15/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/15/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/16/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/16/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/16/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/20/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/20/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/27/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/27/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/27/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/27/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/27/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/27/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/29/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/04/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/04/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/10/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/10/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/10/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/10/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/15/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/15/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/15/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/15/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/15/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/15/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/15/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/15/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/15/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 09/25/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/25/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/25/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/25/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/25/1998
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/25/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/02/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/08/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/08/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/08/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/08/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/09/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/09/1998