Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/04/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/04/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/04/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/25/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/25/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/25/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/25/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/25/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/25/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/25/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/25/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/25/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/25/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/25/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/25/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/25/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/25/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/25/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/25/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/25/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/25/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/25/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/25/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/25/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/25/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/25/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/25/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/25/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/01/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/12/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/12/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/17/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/17/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/24/1998