There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Line Item Veto Act of 1996 to eliminate the requirement that a Federal budget deficit must exist in order for the President to use the line-item veto authority.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/05/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/05/1997Referred to the House Committee on the Budget.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/05/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6923)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/05/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/09/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/09/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/10/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/24/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/24/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/06/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/31/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/24/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Budget09/05/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2424.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2424. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/05/1997)

Amends the Line Item Veto Act of 1996 to remove a requirement that makes the President's line item veto authority contingent on a cancellation (line item veto) reducing the Federal budget deficit.