Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/05/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/09/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/09/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/10/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/24/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/24/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/06/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/06/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/31/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/24/1998