Committees: H.R.2431 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations09/08/1997 Referred to
09/10/1997 Hearings by
03/25/1998 Markup by
04/01/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-480,Part 1
House International Relations Subcommittee on Africa09/18/1997 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade09/18/1997 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights09/18/1997 Referred to
09/18/1997 Markup by
09/18/1997 Reported by
House Ways and Means09/08/1997 Referred to
05/06/1998 Markup by
05/08/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-480,Part 2
House Judiciary09/08/1997 Referred to
05/06/1998 Markup by
05/08/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-480,Part 3
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims09/16/1997 Referred to
03/24/1998 Hearings by
04/30/1998 Markup by
04/30/1998 Reported by
House Banking and Financial Services09/08/1997 Referred to
05/08/1998 Discharged from
House Rules09/08/1997 Referred to
05/08/1998 Discharged from