Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/08/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/08/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/08/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/08/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/08/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/08/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/08/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/08/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/08/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/08/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/08/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/08/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/08/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/08/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/08/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/08/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/08/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/08/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/30/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/30/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/30/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/30/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/30/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/07/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/07/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/12/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/05/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/05/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/05/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/05/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/05/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/27/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/27/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/01/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/22/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/07/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/07/1998