Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/21/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/21/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/31/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/03/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/03/1998