Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 09/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/11/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/18/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/18/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/18/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/26/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/26/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/26/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/26/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/26/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/01/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/09/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/23/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/23/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/13/1997