Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 09/10/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/17/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/17/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/25/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/25/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/25/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/01/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/24/1998