Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/11/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 09/11/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/11/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 09/11/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/11/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 09/11/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/11/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/11/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/11/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/18/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/18/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/18/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/02/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/02/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/02/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/02/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/02/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/02/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/02/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/02/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/02/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/02/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 10/02/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/02/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/02/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/02/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/02/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/02/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/02/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/02/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/02/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/02/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/02/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/02/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/02/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/02/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/02/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/02/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/02/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/02/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 10/02/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/07/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/28/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew