Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/24/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/24/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/05/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/06/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/03/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/26/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/26/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/26/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/21/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/21/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/04/1998