Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 09/17/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/25/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/25/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/26/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/12/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/12/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/12/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/27/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 03/27/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/27/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/27/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/01/1998