Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/18/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/18/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/18/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/18/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/18/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/18/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/18/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/01/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/01/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/01/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/01/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/01/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/01/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/01/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 10/01/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/01/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/01/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/01/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/01/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/01/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/01/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/01/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/01/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/09/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/09/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/21/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/21/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/08/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/25/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew