Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/18/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 09/18/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/29/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/29/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/29/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/29/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/29/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/29/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/29/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/29/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/29/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/29/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/29/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/29/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/29/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/29/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/29/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/29/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/29/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/29/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/29/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/29/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/29/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/29/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/29/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/02/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/02/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/02/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/02/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/02/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/02/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/02/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/02/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/02/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/02/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/07/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/07/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/07/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/21/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/21/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/21/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/31/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/31/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/31/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/31/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/31/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 10/31/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/31/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 10/31/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/31/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/31/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/08/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/13/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/05/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/05/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/05/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/05/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/05/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/05/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/05/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/05/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/12/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/11/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/11/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/11/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/24/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/26/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/29/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew