Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/29/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/24/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew