Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/23/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/09/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/09/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/09/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/09/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/09/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/09/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/09/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/09/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/09/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/09/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/09/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/09/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/09/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/09/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/09/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/09/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/09/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/09/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 11/09/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/09/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 11/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/09/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/09/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 11/09/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/09/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/09/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/09/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 11/09/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/09/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/09/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/13/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/13/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/13/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/13/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/04/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/04/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/04/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/04/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/04/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/04/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/04/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/04/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/01/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/06/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew