Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/18/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/18/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/30/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/30/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/23/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/23/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/23/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/04/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 11/06/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/13/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/03/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/11/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/25/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/25/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/17/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/17/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/17/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/17/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/29/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/29/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/29/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/29/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/29/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/05/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/05/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/05/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/12/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/12/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/12/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/03/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/10/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/17/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/14/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/09/1998