There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow the nonrefundable personal credits, the standard deduction, and the deduction for personal exemptions in determining alternative minimum tax liability.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/23/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/24/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1833)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/23/1997Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/23/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 09/23/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/23/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/29/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/05/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 11/05/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/03/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/03/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/12/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/21/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/09/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/16/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/14/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/23/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 08/05/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/05/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/22/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/09/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/23/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2524. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/23/1997)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to revise the aggregate amount of credits allowed so that such amount shall not exceed the sum of: (1) the taxpayer's regular tax liability; plus (2) the alternative minimum tax amount. Permits the standard deduction and the deduction for personal exemptions to be used in calculating alternative minimum taxable income.