Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/25/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/25/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/25/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/25/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/25/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/25/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/25/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/25/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/25/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/25/1998
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/25/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/25/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/12/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/12/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/12/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/12/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/18/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/24/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/24/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/24/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/24/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/24/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/23/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/23/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/23/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/23/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/23/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/23/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/19/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/19/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/21/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/21/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/16/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/16/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/16/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/16/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/16/1998