Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 09/25/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/25/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 09/25/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/07/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/07/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/07/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/07/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/07/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/07/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/07/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/07/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/07/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/07/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/07/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/13/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/13/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/13/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/04/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/04/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/02/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/02/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/02/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/02/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/15/1998