Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/25/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/27/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/04/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/04/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/11/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/25/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/03/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/22/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/11/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/16/1998