Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/22/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/28/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/04/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/28/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/28/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/03/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/12/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/12/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/12/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/10/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/10/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/17/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/17/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/17/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/17/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/29/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 05/20/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/03/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/17/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/09/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/25/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/01/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/05/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/13/1998