There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the United States Post Office located at 450 North Centre Street in Pottsville, Pennsylvania, as the "Peter J. McCloskey Postal Facility".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/19/1997Became Public Law No: 105-99. (TXT | PDF)
11/19/1997Signed by President.
11/10/1997Presented to President.
11/09/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12419)
11/06/1997Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson without amendment. Without written report.
10/21/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/26/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/19/1997Became Public Law No: 105-99. (TXT | PDF)
11/19/1997Signed by President.
11/10/1997HousePresented to President.
11/10/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/09/1997SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12419)
11/06/1997SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 264.
11/06/1997SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson without amendment. Without written report.
11/05/1997SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/22/1997SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
10/21/1997-1:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/21/1997-1:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/21/1997-1:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/21/1997-1:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8856-8857)
10/21/1997-1:34pmHouseMr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/07/1997HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
10/07/1997HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/30/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
09/26/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
09/26/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform and Oversight09/26/1997 Referred to
10/07/1997 Markup by
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Postal Service09/30/1997 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs10/22/1997 Referred to
11/05/1997 Markup by
11/06/1997 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2564.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2564. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/26/1997)

Designates the United States Post Office located at 450 North Centre Street in Pottsville, Pennsylvania, as the Peter J. McCloskey Postal Facility.