There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Veterans Medical Facility Construction bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize major medical facility projects and major medical facility leases for the Department of Veterans Affairs for fiscal year 1998, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/06/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/02/1997Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 105-291.
09/29/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/07/1997SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs.
10/06/1997-2:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/06/1997-2:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/06/1997-2:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/06/1997-2:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8368-8369)
10/06/1997-2:32pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/02/1997HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
10/02/1997HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 105-291.
09/30/1997HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
09/30/1997HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/29/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
09/29/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/29/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/29/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/29/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/02/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/02/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs09/29/1997 Referred to
09/30/1997 Markup by
10/02/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-291
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/07/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2571. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/1997)

Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out: (1) seismic corrections at the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in Memphis, Tennessee; (2) seismic corrections and clinical and other improvements to the McClellan Hospital at Mather Field, Sacramento, California; and (3) outpatient improvements at Mare Island, Vallejo, California, and Martinez, California. Specifies the funds that may be used for such purposes.

Authorizes the Secretary to enter into leases for: (1) an information management field office in Birmingham, Alabama; (2) satellite outpatient clinics in Jacksonville, Florida, Boston, Massachusetts, Canton, Ohio, Portland, Oregon, and Tulsa, Oklahoma; and (3) an information resources management field office in Salt Lake City, Utah.

Authorizes appropriations to the Secretary for FY 1998 for the Construction, Major Projects, account and for the Medical Care account.