Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 10/01/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 10/01/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 10/01/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/09/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/30/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/30/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/30/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/30/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/30/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/30/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/30/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/30/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/30/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/30/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/31/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/31/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/31/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/31/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/31/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/31/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/31/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/31/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/31/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/31/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/31/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/31/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/31/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/06/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 11/06/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/06/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/07/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/07/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/08/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/08/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/08/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/08/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/09/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/09/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 11/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/09/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/09/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/09/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 11/09/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/12/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/12/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/12/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/12/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 11/12/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/12/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/12/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/12/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/11/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/11/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/11/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/11/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/11/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/02/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/02/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/02/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/02/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/12/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/01/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/30/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/30/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/04/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/24/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/24/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/24/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/1998