Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/21/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/05/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/13/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/06/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/06/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/06/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/28/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/28/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/28/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/28/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/25/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/29/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/26/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 10/07/1998