Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/02/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 10/02/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 10/02/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 10/02/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 10/02/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/07/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/07/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/08/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/08/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/21/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/21/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/24/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/24/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/24/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/24/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/24/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/24/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/28/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/28/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/28/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/28/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/28/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/28/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/04/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/04/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/04/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/12/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/12/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/05/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/05/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/28/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/28/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/03/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/03/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew