There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To make a regulatory correction concerning methyl bromide to meet the obligations of the Montreal Protocol without placing the farmers of the United States at a competitive disadvantage versus foreign growers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/06/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
10/27/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
10/14/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Nutrition and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/06/1997Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
10/06/1997Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
10/06/1997Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/06/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/09/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/21/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/21/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/21/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/28/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/28/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/29/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/31/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/31/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/31/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/04/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/05/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/05/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/19/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/22/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/16/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/05/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce10/06/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/27/1997 Referred to
House Agriculture10/06/1997 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Nutrition and Foreign Agriculture10/14/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2609.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2609. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/06/1997)

Prohibits the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency from controlling the consumption, production, importation, or export of methyl bromide for pesticide use, except: (1) as required by the Montreal Protocol of all parties; or (2) upon a Department of Agriculture certification of appropriate alternatives or substitutes.