Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/09/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/21/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/21/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/21/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/28/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/28/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/29/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/31/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/31/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/31/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/31/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/31/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/04/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/05/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/05/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/17/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/19/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/19/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/22/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/16/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/05/1998