There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Religious Fairness in Bankruptcy Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 11, United States Code, to declare that donations to a religious group or entity, made by a debtor from a sense of religious obligation, such as tithes, shall be considered to have been made in exchange for a reasonably equivalent value.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/06/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/12/1998Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law
10/16/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/06/1997Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/06/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (107)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/07/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/21/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/06/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/06/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/06/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/07/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/07/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/07/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/07/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/07/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/07/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/09/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/12/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/12/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/12/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/12/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/12/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/12/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/12/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/12/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/03/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/06/1997 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law10/16/1997 Referred to
02/12/1998 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2611.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/06/1997)

Religious Fairness in Bankruptcy Act of 1997 - Amends Federal bankruptcy law, with respect to avoidance of fraudulent transfers and obligations by the bankruptcy trustee, to provide that a transfer of a donation to a religious unit made by a debtor from a sense of religious obligation such as tithes, shall be considered to have been made in exchange for a reasonably equivalent value.