Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 10/06/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/07/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/21/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/06/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/06/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/06/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/07/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/07/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/07/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/07/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/07/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/07/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/07/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/07/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/07/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/07/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/09/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/09/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 11/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 11/09/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/09/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/12/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/12/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/12/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 11/12/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/12/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/12/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/12/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/12/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/12/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/13/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/03/1998