Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/22/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 10/22/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/22/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/22/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/22/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/22/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/22/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/22/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/23/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/23/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/23/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/23/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/23/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/23/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/23/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/23/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/23/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/23/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/23/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/28/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 10/28/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/29/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/29/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/29/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/04/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/04/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/04/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/04/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/08/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 11/08/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/08/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 11/13/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/13/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/27/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 01/27/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/27/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/27/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 01/27/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 01/27/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/28/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/28/1998