Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 10/07/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 10/07/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/08/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/08/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/09/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/09/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/09/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/09/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/09/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/09/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/09/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 10/09/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/23/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/04/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/04/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/04/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/05/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/05/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/06/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/06/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/1997