Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/05/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 11/05/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/04/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/04/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/10/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/10/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/10/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/10/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/10/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/10/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/10/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/10/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 06/16/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/16/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/16/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/16/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/16/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/24/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/24/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/24/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/23/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/23/1998