Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 10/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/1998