Committees: H.R.2675 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform and Oversight10/21/1997 Referred to
10/31/1997 Markup by
11/04/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-373
House Government Reform and Oversight Subcommittee on Civil Service10/22/1997 Referred to
10/22/1997 Markup by
10/22/1997 Reported by
Senate Governmental Affairs11/05/1997 Referred to
06/17/1998 Markup by
09/21/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-337